THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:54:17 AM
Golrokhian Sani, Mohammad Reza
CPSO#:
97179
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Azari, English, Farsi
Education: Shiraz University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Port Arthur Health Clinic
194 Court St.N
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4V7
Phone: (807)346-1000 Ext. 7756
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:23 Dec 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 25 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2023 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2028 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 24, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)