THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:46:36 AM
Thompson, Tamara Karlene
CPSO#:
97170
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of the West Indies, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 22 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Mar 2012 to 30 Dec 2012
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |