THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:40:22 AM
Atrey, Amit
CPSO#:
97167
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Hindi, Italian
Education: University of London, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
804 - 55 Queen St E
Toronto ON M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5342
Fax: (416) 864-5398
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:19 Dec 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 28 Feb 2012
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 29 Feb 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2024 |
|
Active |