THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 4:20:15 AM
Nwapa, Sylvia Idu
CPSO#:
97165
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Nigeria, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1535 Ottawa St
Windsor ON N8X 2G3
Phone: 5192543579
Fax: 5199663332
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jan 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jan 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 21 Aug 2013 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 27 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 29 Sep 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 29 Sep 2020 |
|
Active |