THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:29:04 AM
Chacko, Binita Riya
CPSO#:
97138
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jan 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
31 Jan 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Christian Medical College, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 89787
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Binita Chacko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 22 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:31 Jan 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2020 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jan 2027 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2022 |
|
Active |