THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:11:41 AM
Ananthan, Yasotha Diana
CPSO#:
97135
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ananthan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 16 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jun 2019 |