THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:06:50 PM
Menard, Matthew Robert Noel
CPSO#:
97127
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Non-Binary
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Northern Haida Gwaii Hospital
2520 Harrison Avenue
Masset BC V0T 1M0
Phone: (250) 626-4700
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Northwest Territories
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jul 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ROBERT NOEL MENARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENARD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 03 Jan 2012 to 15 Jan 2012
EL - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2012 to 27 Jan 2012
EL - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2012 |