THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:28:28 AM
Doufle, Ghislaine Yawavi
CPSO#:
97121
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Aug 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Universite Pierre et Marie Curie, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Medicine
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4645
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:16 Aug 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:22 Apr 2024 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 19 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jun 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2018 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Aug 2018 |
|
Active |