THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 11:40:02 AM
Sokolova, Elena Anatolievna
CPSO#:
97119
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: MOSCOW MEDICAL STOMATOLOGY INSTITUTE, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-0185
Fax: (416) 289-0187
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:20 Dec 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Dec 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
|
Active |