THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:01:50 AM
Obead, Khaireldeen Hasan Nimer
CPSO#:
97113
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jan 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Mosul, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2C1
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2022 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHAIRELDEEN HASAN NIMER OBEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBEAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2012 to 02 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 03 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2023 |