Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 22, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ejaz Ahmad to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 22, 2019:
The College received information from another jurisdiction about Dr. Ahmad's family medicine practice. Based on the information, Dr. Ahmad has agreed to provide notice to and obtain approval from the College before commencing practice in Ontario.
In addition, Dr. Ahmad will not engage in any of the following areas of practice in Ontario:
(i)The performance of circumcisions or vasectomies at any location;
(ii)The performance of any surgical or surgical dermatological procedures outside of a hospital setting;
(iii)The practice of medicine in any Out-of-Hospital Premises.
Upon commencing practice in Ontario, Dr. Ahmad will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
Dr. Ahmad's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
Source:
Other Canadian Colleges
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: December 14, 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
_ _
On December 14, 2018, the Inquiry Panel of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Manitoba ordered that Dr. Ahmad: (a) be reprimanded; (b) be suspended from the practice of medicine for five months effective October 15, 2018; (c) be indefinitely suspended from the practice of medicine until he completes a course on medical professionalism and ethics; and (d) be prohibited from performing circumcisions (this prohibition may be varied or deleted if he undergoes satisfactory formal training and education or is supervised when conducting circumcisions, and is assessed as being able to safely and competently perform circumcisions). Dr. Ahmad had pleaded guilty on October 15, 2018 to committing professional misconduct and to displaying a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment in the practice of medicine, specifically in his performance of circumcisions, behaviour in an unprofessional and unethical manner, and providing misleading information to the Manitoba College regarding the creation of medical records. The College learned of this finding on December 20, 2018.