THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:47:54 PM
Bahzad, Shakir F A M H
CPSO#:
97097
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
08 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:30 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 17 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Dec 2014
CF - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Dec 2014 |