THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:55:27 AM
Rolnitsky, Asaph
CPSO#:
97093
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical S, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Room 1436
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5710
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:17 Feb 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2011 to 16 Feb 2012
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Dec 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Oct 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Jan 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2023 |
|
Active |