THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:18:13 AM
Zammit-Maempel, Joseph George
CPSO#:
97091
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Mar 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Mar 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Maltese
Education: University of Dundee, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1338 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0G1
Phone: 289 267 0478
Fax: 905 687 9394
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH GEORGE ZAMMIT-MAEMPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMMIT-MAEMPEL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 02 May 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 2019 |