THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 11:37:20 AM
Horne, Pamela Ellen
CPSO#:
97086
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Nov 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Nov 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAMELA ELLEN HORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORNE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Dec 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Mar 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Dec 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2019 |