THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:04:54 AM
Bigi, Sandra
CPSO#:
97079
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
24 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Basel, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2011 to 16 Feb 2012
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 17 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Oct 2014
CF - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Oct 2014 |