THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:11:07 PM
Gill, Vikramjit Singh
CPSO#:
97078
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Punjabi University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Vikramjit Singh Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 13 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Dec 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 27 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2015 |