THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:26:53 AM
Razack, Vanessa Amina
CPSO#:
97076
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatric Emergency
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 201753
Fax: (416) 813-5285
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Vanessa A. Razack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Pediatrics |
Effective:06 Dec 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Dec 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |
|
Active |