THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:42:53 AM
Michelis, Fotios
CPSO#:
97052
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Athens, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700 University Avenue Suite 6-614
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4013
Fax: (416) 946-4407
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematology |
Effective:01 Apr 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2011 to 14 Feb 2012
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Mar 2016
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2023 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 01 Mar 2025 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2024 |
|
Active |