THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:13:40 PM
Stewart, James Kenneth
CPSO#:
97020
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: International American University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
339 Hume St
Collingwood ON L9Y 1W4
Phone: 705-443-8200
Fax: 705-443-4311
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES KENNETH STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 08 Nov 2011 to 30 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 31 Jan 2012 to 07 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 08 Nov 2012 to 07 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2013 |