THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 21:17:54 PM
Kopolovic, Ilana Rebecca
CPSO#:
97015
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3625
Fax: (905) 721-4741
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:30 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ILANA REBECCA KOPOLOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPOLOVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 20 Nov 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
EL - Critical Care Medicine
McMaster University, 07 May 2012 to 01 Jun 2012
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
EL - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Jul 2012
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |