THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:53:04 PM
O'Donoghue, Rory
CPSO#:
96997
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Appletree Medical Group
Suite 210
1902 Robertson Road
Ottawa, ON K2H 5B8
Date Received: 11 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2014 |