THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:17:46 AM
Rowe, David Simon
CPSO#:
96995
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON L9P 1S4
Phone: (905) 8529771
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Shore Health Network |
Blind River |
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital |
Uxbridge |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Jan 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID SIMON ROWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2014 |