THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:26:07 AM
Desarkar, Pushpal
CPSO#:
96963
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: University of Calcutta, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Adult Neurodevelopmental Services
401 - 1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32726
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:22 Mar 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Oct 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Mar 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Mar 2019 |
|
Active |