THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:17:21 PM
Ferreyra Galliani, Mariella
CPSO#:
96937
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad San Martin De Porres, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
418 Eglinton Avenue W
Toronto ON M5N 1A2
Phone: 647-479-8410 Ext. 1
Fax: 647-689-3720
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Peru
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIELLA FERREYRA GALLIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERREYRA GALLIANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |