THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:50:59 PM
Donaldson, Elizabeth Ann
CPSO#:
96934
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON N3T 3J2
Phone: 519-753-8666
Fax: 519-753-6880
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Feb 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN DONALDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONALDSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2012 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2014 |