THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 11:31:04 AM
Buckle, Christopher Eric
CPSO#:
96932
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G
Phone: 4038665446
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Lakeridge Health |
Oshawa |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft |
Bancroft |
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site |
Picton |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ERIC BUCKLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKLE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 12 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2012 |