THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:33:25 AM
Sadreddini, Masoud
CPSO#:
96929
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: State University of Groningen, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5N3
Phone: 8073453355
Fax: 8073450099
Electoral District: 09
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Netherlands
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:24 Mar 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 12 Dec 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 13 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Sep 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2023 |
|
Active |