THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:56:33 AM
Bekasiak, Ann Mary
CPSO#:
96911
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish
Education: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS. 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6. (416) 398-0638
Date Received: 23 Dec 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jan 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANN MARY BEKASIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEKASIAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2015 |