THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:01:02 PM
Henry, Heather Leslie
CPSO#:
96908
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
Northwest Territories
Nunavut
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2012 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Aug 2021 |