THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 6:38:53 AM
Kuhlmann, Emily Thelma
CPSO#:
96895
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON M9C 2Z4
Phone: (416) 622-0933
Fax: 416 391 6119
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:30 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMILY THELMA KUHLMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHLMANN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2013 |