THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:02:46 AM
Erragamreddy, Sai Kalyan Reddy
CPSO#:
96889
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Telugu
Education: Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300 Rossland Rd E
Ajax ON L1Z 0M1
Phone: 905-239-7663
Fax: 905-239-4664
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4
Telephone: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 28 Apr 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAI KALYAN REDDY ERRAGAMREDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERRAGAMREDDY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Jan 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2015 |