THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 12:31:37 PM
Tytus, Stephen
CPSO#:
96886
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2-250 Argyle St N
Caledonia ON N3W 1K9
Phone: 289-210-7090
Fax: 289-757-2289
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN TYTUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TYTUS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Jan 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2014 |