THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:34:46 AM
Perera, Chamika Nilanga
CPSO#:
96880
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Perera, Welikadage Chamika Nilanga (used until: 17 Feb 2014 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhala
Education: UNIVERSITY OF SRI JAYEWARDENEPURA, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
908 B Garth street
Hamilton
Hamilton ON L9C 4L2
Phone: (905) 383-8026
Fax: (905) 383-8446
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Feb 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHAMIKA NILANGA PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2014 |