THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:38:22 PM
Choudhry, Netan
CPSO#:
96870
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Nov 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Georgetown University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Vitreous Retina Macula
Specialists of Toronto
3280 Bloor St. W. Suite 310
Etobicoke, ON M8X 2X4
Toronto ON M8X 2X3
Phone: 647-361-7575
Fax: 647-361-4585
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:15 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Oct 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 27 Nov 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2014 |
|
Active |