THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:32:24 AM
Patel, Chirag Manubhai
CPSO#:
96861
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Nov 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging MG162
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:08 Nov 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 02 Dec 2011
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Mar 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Mar 2020 |
|
Active |