THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:56:09 PM
Hansen, Shandi Michelle
CPSO#:
96855
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
28 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Univ of California, San Francisco, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Palliative Care
9NU-929
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4800 Ext. 2674
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 12 Sep 2018
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 07 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2019 |
|
Active |