THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:40:19 AM
Lin, Lily Qing
CPSO#:
96841
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
22 Nov 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:14 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2011 to 28 Oct 2011
EL - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 26 Oct 2015 to 22 Nov 2015
EL - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Nov 2015 |