THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:30:24 PM
Atiyah, Abdulrazzak Oglah
CPSO#:
96833
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
New Waterford Consolidated Hospital
Division of Plastic and
Reconstructive Surgery
716 King Street
New Waterford NS B1H 3Z5
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:716 King Street
New Waterford, NS B1H 3Z5
Date Received: 23 May 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:24 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDULRAZZAK OGLAH ATIYAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATIYAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2023 |