THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:14:15 AM
Kolar, Dusan
CPSO#:
96820
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Belgrade, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Department of Psychiatry
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Oct 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2017 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2027 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Apr 2022 |
|
Active |