THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:13:49 AM
Cassie, Scott Gordon
CPSO#:
96819
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
#105 984 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7C7
Phone: 807-346-1440
Fax: 807-346-1445
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SCOTT GORDON CASSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASSIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
EL - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 03 Oct 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |