THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:31:24 AM
Benhameid, Osama Saleh
CPSO#:
96785
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Garyounis University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Oct 2011 to 04 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 31 May 2014
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2014 |