THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:31:05 AM
Daniel, Shanon Mary
CPSO#:
96782
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Malayalam
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
710 Dorval Drive, Suite 701
Oakville ON L6K 3V7
Phone: 905-338-3937
Fax: 905-338-3930
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHANON MARY DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 26 Sep 2011 to 07 Oct 2011
EL - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2012 |