THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:02:07 AM
Khan, Mateen Abdul-Rahman
CPSO#:
96780
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Temple University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Sep 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Mar 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2014 |