THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:43:28 AM
Naji, Nizar Abbas
CPSO#:
96766
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Mosul, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Essex Respiratory Services
109 - 13278 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh ON N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 956-9891
Fax: (519) 956-8082
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:15 Dec 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NIZAR ABBAS NAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAJI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 11 Nov 2011
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 12 Nov 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2015 |