THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 7:48:59 AM
Alhammad, Fahad Abdullah S
CPSO#:
96725
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
EL - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 18 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
McMaster University, 18 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
McMaster University, 18 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Critical Care Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2015 |