THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:08:18 PM
DeLuca, Terry Kenneth
CPSO#:
96712
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Mar 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Mar 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Harrow Family Health Center Inc
1480 Erie Road South
PO Box 430
Harrow ON N0R 1G0
Phone: (519) 738-2000
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TERRY KENNETH DELUCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELUCA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Aug 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 2013 |