THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 8:14:06 AM
von Schlegell, Ahmad Shariff
CPSO#:
96697
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
12 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Rush Medical College, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5415
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Aug 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:07 Nov 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 11 Feb 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Dec 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Dec 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Dec 2013 |
|
Active |