THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:58:45 AM
Naidu, Padmaja Rakesh
CPSO#:
96647
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Telugu
Education: Baroda University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1720 Howard Avenue, Suite 164
Windsor ON N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 948-8000
Fax: (519) 948-9191
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 Jul 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Dec 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Dec 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Dec 2013 |
|
Active |