THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:38:34 AM
Naaman, Saad Cyril
CPSO#:
96638
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
26 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Turkish
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Dept of Phys Med and Rehabilitation
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5184
Fax: (519) 257-5137
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Naaman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:26 Jul 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 25 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 Oct 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2013 |
|
Active |